+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
- Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill)
- Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
- Committee of Conference report adopted
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator French for Committee, text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators French, McAllister, and White
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker appointed Reps. Hubert of Milton, Sweaney of Windsor and Higley of Lowell as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
- Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Hubert of Milton
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
- 3rd reading ordered
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- Rep. Hubert of Milton reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor