+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- New Business/Second Reading
- Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Rep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
- Rep. Rosenquist of Georgia reported for the committee on Human Services
- Read Second Time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor