+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on April 19, 2019
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on April 15, 2019
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
- Rep. Hooper of Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations