+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 15, 2018
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions as amended agreed to
- Report of the Committee on Corrections and Institutions amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Macaig of Williston reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions
- Read Second Time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rep. Macaig of Williston moved to commit bill to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor