+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on July 13, 2020
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on July 7, 2020
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on July 13, 2020
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Bray
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Report of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Lefebvre of Newark reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
- Rep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro reported for the committee on Ways and Means
- Third Reading Ordered
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester disagreed to
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Helm of Fair Haven disagreed to
- Rep. Burditt of West Rutland moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife which was disagreed to
- Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife as amended agreed to
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 5
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 3, 2020: Shall the bill be amended as recommended by the Committee of Natural Resources, Fish and Wildlife, as amended?
- Yeas: 138
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 6