+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2018
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on June 19, 2018
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on 6/13/2018
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Roll Call, requested by Senator Branagan, Passed -- Needed 19 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 4
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Passed
- Read Third time
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
- Read Second Time
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
+ − Vote
June 7, 2018: Pending entry on the Calendar for Notice shall the rules be suspended and the bill be taken up for immediate consideration?
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor