+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Finance
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On May 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Read Second Time
- Rep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
- Report of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
- Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to
- Read Third time
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to postpone action until the end of the orders of the day which was agreed to
- Rep. Cina of Burlington asked permission to offer an amendment after third reading
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Cina of Burlington moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
- Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor