+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on March 30, 2020
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on 3/26/2020
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Rep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, Pollina, and White; text
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read First Time
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Read 2nd time
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, Pollina, and White agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town
- Read Third time and Passed
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
- Report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as offered by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry
- Rep. Jerome of Brandon reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
- Read Second Time
- Rep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor