+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on 4/28/2010
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on 4/22/2010
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Passed the House and Senate on 4/20/2010
On April 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator Kittell for Committee on Agriculture, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture
- New Business/Second Reading
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Sears
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Agriculture agreed to.
- Rep. Toll of Danville spoke for the committee on Agriculture
- Read Second Time
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor