+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
- Reported favorably by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On May 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- Rep. Evans of Essex moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations, which was agreed to.
- Rep. Branagan of Georgia spoke for the committee on Ways and Means
- Rep. Evans of Essex reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor