+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on February 25, 2014
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 2
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
- New Business/Second Reading
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 110, Nays = 33
- Read Third time and Passed
- Rep. Ellis of Waterbury moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
- Rep. Heath of Westford moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Higley of Lowell moved to amend the bill which was disagreed to
- Rep. Heath of Westford spoke for the committee on Appropriations
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Bill read first time
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2014: Shall the bill be read the third time?
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2014: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
House Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor