+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2022
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 3, 2022
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on April 27, 2022
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
- Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Pearson motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Roll Call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Action Calendar: Third reading
- Read Third time and passed
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment
- Read Second time
- Rep. Goslant of Northfield reported for the Committee on Judiciary
- Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Third Reading ordered
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment
- Rep. Goslant of Northfield moved to postpone action until March 17, 2022 which was agreed to
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 8, 2022: Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2