+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 27, 2022
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
- Senate proposal of amendment considered
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 27, 2022
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Senate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Partridge of Windham and Surprenant of Barnard
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
- Rep. McCoy of Poultney moved to deliver the bill to the Governor forthwith, which was agreed to
- Delivered to the Governor on May 23, 2022
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Agriculture
- Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations
- 3rd reading ordered
- Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Agriculture intact, on motion of Senator Starr
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Read Third time and passed
- Action Calendar: Third reading
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rep. Surprenant of Barnard reported for the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
- Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment
- Read Second time
- Third Reading ordered
- Rep. Toleno of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
- Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
- Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
- Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor