+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (76)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on June 5, 2019
- Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
- Roll Call, requested by Senator McNeil, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2
- 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 6
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Rep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the bill
- Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland raised a Point of Order
- Amendment of Rep. Bancroft of Westford ruled not germane
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 37, Nays = 109
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 40, Nays = 106
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to
- Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 37, Nays = 108
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to
- Rep. McFaun of Barre Town moved to amend the bill
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 37, Nays = 106
- Amendment as offered by Rep. McFaun of Barre Town disagreed to
- Rep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the bill
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 113
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford disagreed to
- Read Third time
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 106, Nays = 37
- Passed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Pugh of South Burlington reported for the committee on Human Services
- Rep. Grad of Moretown reported for the committee on Judiciary
- Report of the Committee on Human Services amended as recommended by the Committee on Judiciary
- Rep. Rosenquist of Georgia moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 41, Nays = 106
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Rosenquist of Georgia disagreed to
- Rep. Rosenquist of Georgia and Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 40, Nays = 107
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Rosenquist of Georgia and Bancroft of Westford disagreed to
- Rep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford withdrawn
- Rep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 32, Nays = 115
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford disagreed to
- Rep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 123
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford disagreed to
- Rep. Strong of Albany moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 113
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Strong of Albany disagreed to
- Rep. Strong of Albany moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 13, Nays = 131
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Strong of Albany disagreed to
- Rep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the report of the committee on Human Services
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 43, Nays = 101
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford disagreed to
- Report of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 104, Nays = 40
- Third Reading Ordered
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (16)
May 7, 2019: Shall the bill be read the third time?
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
May 7, 2019: Shall the Senate propose to the House to amend the bill as recommended by the Committee on Health and Welfare?
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
February 21, 2019: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford?
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 113
- Absent: 8
February 21, 2019: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 7
February 21, 2019: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield?
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 109
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2019: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield?
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 108
- Absent: 4
February 21, 2019: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield?
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 106
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2019: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. McFaun of Barre Town?
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 106
- Absent: 6
February 20, 2019: Shall the report of the Committee on Human Services be amended as offered by Rep. Rosenquist of Georgia and Rep. Bancroft of Westford?
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 107
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2019: Shall the report of the Committee on Human Services be amended as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford?
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 123
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2019: Shall the report of the Committee on Human Services be amended as offered by Rep. Strong of Albany?
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 113
- Absent: 3
February 20, 2019: Shall the report of the Committee on Human Services be amended as offered by Rep. Strong of Albany?
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 131
- Absent: 5
February 20, 2019: Shall the report of the Committee on Human Services be amended as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford?
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 101
- Absent: 5
February 20, 2019: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 5
February 20, 2019: Shall the report of the Committee on Human Services be amended as offered by Rep. Rosenquist of Georgia?
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 106
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2019: Shall the report of the Committee on Human Services be amended as offered by Rep. Bancroft of Westford?
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 115
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (89)
Type:
Primary Sponsor