+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Harrison of Chittenden moved to amend the bill
- Rep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Masland of Thetford recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
- Rep. Squirrell of Underhill reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish and Wildlife
- Read Second Time
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish and Wildlife
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor