+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 23, 2019
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 17, 2019
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Harrison of Chittenden reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor