+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Consideration Postponed/Second Reading
On May 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed without objection
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- New Business/Second Reading
On May 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Agriculture as amended agreed to
- Rep. Conquest of Newbury moved to amend the recommendation of amendment offered by Agriculture
- Rep. Conquest of Newbury spoke for the committee on Agriculture
- Read Second Time
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Rep. Conquest of Newbury moved to postpone action until 3/18/2010 which was agreed to
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Agriculture which was agreed to.
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary