+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on June 6, 2017
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on June 5, 2017
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 30, 2017
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Read Third time and Passed
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
- Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor