+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 5, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012
- Delivered to the Governor on 5/8/2012
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Passed the House and Senate on 5/2/2012
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Koch of Barre Town
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
On April 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
On April 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Rep. Krebs of South Hero moved to amend the bill
- Rep. Krebs of South Hero asked that the question be divided
- Second instance of amendment agreed to
- Read Third time and Passed
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
- Rep. Bissonnette of Winooski, recommended for the committee on Transportation
- Rep. Koch of Barre Town reported for the committee on Judiciary
- Read Second Time
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rep. Koch of Barre Town moved to commit bill to the committee on Transportation which was agreed to.
- Rep. Koch of Barre Town moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor