+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 22, 2017
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 22, 2017
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 17, 2017
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message House adopted Conference Committee report
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill)
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- Committee of Conference report adopted
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Lyons for Committee, text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Lyons
- Committee of Conference Report
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, Ayer, and Ingram
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Speaker appointed Pugh of South Burlington, Mrowicki of Putney and Rosenquist of Georgia as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
- Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Mrowicki of Putney
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- 3rd reading ordered
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
- Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Trieber of Rockingham recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Mrowicki of Putney spoke for the committee on Human Services
- Read Second Time
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Bill read first time