+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 4, 2017
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 4, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton.
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Ashe, and Mullin
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as moved by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Ashe, and Mullin
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Ashe, and Mullin
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Ashe, and Mullin
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
- Rep. Houghton of Essex moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Houghton of Essex spoke for the committee on Health Care
- Read Second Time
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Bill read first time