+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 13, 2015
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations
- Read Second Time
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 24 V.S.A. App. §§ 155B-1-4. Redesignated. 2013, No. M-20 (Adj. Sess.), Section 2, eff. June 3, 2014 -
- 24 V.S.A. App. º155B-1 - Town Treasurer
- 24 V.S.A. App. §155B-1 - Town Treasurer
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor