+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Carr of Brandon
- Rep. Carr of Brandon reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Rep. Botzow of Pownal moved to commit bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development which was agreed to.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- New Business/Second Reading
- 3rd reading ordered
- Read 2nd time
- Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Finance
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Ashe agreed to
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Read Third time and Passed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to and Third Reading Ordered
- Rep. Carr of Brandon reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
- Read Second Time
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor