+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 16, 2022
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 16, 2022
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 10, 2022
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in concurrence
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations
- Reported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Read 2nd time
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- New Business/Second Reading
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Read Third time and passed
- Action Calendar: Third reading
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading ordered
- Rep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Satcowitz of Randolph reported for the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
- Read Second time
- Action Calendar: Favorable
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Favorable
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
- Notice Calendar: Favorable
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor