+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (75)
On June 9, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on 6/3/2010
On May 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg demanded yeas and nays
- Passed the House and Senate on 5/8/2010
On May 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
On May 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
- Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill)
On May 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Sears, Campbell, and Nitka
On May 8, 2010 in the House:
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 63 of 125 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 1
On May 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text
- Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
On May 7, 2010 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
- Speaker appointed Lippert of Hinesburg, Koch of Barre Town and Jewett of Ripton as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
- Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg
On May 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears; text
- New Business/Third Reading
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Shumlin, Illuzzi, Mullin, and Sears
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
- Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi
- Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Shumlin, Illuzzi, Mullin, and Sears
- Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Cummings agreed to
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears agreed to
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Illuzzi; text
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Illuzzi agreed to
- Consideration resumed on proposal of amendment of Senators Shumlin, Illuzzi, Mullin and Sears
- Motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 14, Nays = 16
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Cummings; text
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
On May 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Second Reading
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
- Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
On April 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- On motion of Senator Shumlin, Senate Rule 49 suspended and bill committed to Committee on Finance with report of Committee on Judiciary intact, with instructions to consider affect on state revenues only
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
On March 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City moved to amend the bill
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
- Rep. Fisher of Lincoln and Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Fisher of Lincoln withdrawn
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City withdrawn
- Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City asked that the question be divided
- First Instance of amendment agreed to
- Second Instance of amendment disagreed to
- Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City moved to amend the bill
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City disagreed to
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 32, Nays = 110
- Rep. Young of St. Albans City moved to amend the bill
- Rep. Young of St. Albans City asked leave to withdraw motion
- Rep. Clark of Vergennes moved to amend the bill
- Rep. Grad of Moretown raised a Point of Order
- Amendment of Rep. Clark of Vergennes ruled not germane
- Read Third time and Passed
- Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City demanded yeas and nays
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City demanded yeas and nays
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg spoke for the committee on Judiciary
- Rep. Heath of Westford spoke for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City moved to amend the recommendation of amendment offered by Judiciary
- Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 38, Nays = 108
- Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City moved to amend the recommendation of amendment offered by Judiciary
- Which was disagreed to.
- Rep. Corcoran of Bennington demanded yeas and nays
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 104, Nays = 40
- Third Reading Ordered
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On January 5, 2010 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Which was disagreed to.
+ − Votes (7)
May 8, 2010: Shall the report of the Committee of Conference be adopted?
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 24
May 8, 2010: Shall the Senate accept and adopt the report of the Committee of Conference ?
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 1
May 4, 2010: Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 30
May 4, 2010: Shall the Senate proposal of amendment be amended as moved by Senators Shumlin, Illuzzi, Mullin and Sears?
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
March 24, 2010: Shall the bill as offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City?
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 110
- Absent: 7
March 23, 2010: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 5
March 23, 2010: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Kilmartin on Newport City?
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 108
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor