+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 7, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, Committee of Conference members appointed
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Campion, Hooker, and Perchlik
- House message: House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Speaker appointed Webb of Shelburne, James of Manchester and Cupoli of Rutland City as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Webb of Shelburne moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a Committee of Conference
- Senate proposal of amendment considered
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Hooker for Committee on Education
- Question on Secs 7, 8 & 9 and Secs 10 & 11 divided on request of Senator White
- Committee on Education Secs 1-6 recommendation of amendment agreed to
- Committee on Education Secs. 7, 8 & 9 recommendation of amendment agreed to
- Roll Call, requested by Senator Hooker, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8
- Roll Call, requested by Senator Hooker, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 12
- Committee on Education Sec. 12 recommendation of amendment agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
- Committee on Education Secs. 10 & 11 recommendation of amendment agreed to
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Read Third time and passed
- Action Calendar: Third reading
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second time
- Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment
- Third Reading ordered
- Rep. James of Manchester reported for the Committee on Education
- Rep. James of Manchester, Arrison of Weathersfield, Austin of Colchester, Brady of Williston, Brown of Richmond, Conlon of Cornwall, Cupoli of Rutland City, Hooper of Randolph, Toof of St. Albans Town, Webb of Shelburne, and Williams of Granby mov
- Report of Committee on Education as amended agreed to
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Action postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. James of Manchester
- Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2022: Shall the Senate propose to the House to amend the bill as recommended by the Committee on Education in Secs. 7, 8 and 9?
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
April 29, 2022: Shall the Senate proposed to the House to amend the bill as recommended by the Committee on Education in Secs. 10 and 11?
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor