+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 131, Nays = 0
- Third Reading Ordered
- Read Second Time
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Rep. Rep. Sharpe of Bristol spoke for the committee on Ways and Means
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar for Notice on 4/13/2011
+ − Vote
April 15, 2011: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 131
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsor
House Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor