+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (59)
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 24, 2022
- Delivered to the Governor on May 18, 2022
On May 7, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
- New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
- Action Calendar: Amendment offered by Rep Anthony of Barre City
- Senate proposal of amendment considered
- Rep. Anthony of Barre City moved to concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto
- Which was agreed to
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Rep. Anthony of Barre City moved to commit bill to the Committee on Government Operations which was agreed to
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Rep. Anthony of Barre City moved to postpone action until April 6, 2022 which was agreed to
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
- Action postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Anthony of Barre City
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Rep. Copeland Hanzas of Bradford moved to postpone action until March 31, 2022 which was agreed to
- Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Third Reading
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- New Business/Third Reading
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations
- Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Unfinished Business/Second Reading
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- New Business/Second Reading
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
- Read Third time and passed
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading ordered
- Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to
- Rep. Anthony of Barre City reported for the Committee on Government Operations
- Read Second time
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor