+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (76)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Veto of the Governor overriden by a vote of 100 Yea, 50 Nay
- Delivered to the Governor on 5/28/2009
- Vetoed by the Governor on 6/1/2009
On May 9, 2009 in the House:
- 2/3 vote of 100 Needed
On May 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- See entry for H. 441, relating to override of Governor's veto, during special session convened on June 2, 2009
- Governor vetoed bill; text of Governor's veto message
On May 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin.
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 91, Nays = 52
- Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe demanded yeas and nays
- Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill)
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Bartlett for Committee, text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Bartlett, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 10
- Senator Choate explained vote
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Bartlett
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith as moved by Rep. Leriche of Hardwick
- Speaker appointed Heath of Westford, Larson of Burlington and Morley of Barton as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
- Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Heath of Westford
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Leriche of Hardwick
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senator Mullin requested & granted leave to withdraw motion
- New Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator Mullin
- Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator Illuzzi
- Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Bartlett
- Senator(s) Bartlett motion to substitute amendment for 8th amendment offered to amend Senate proposal of amendment agreed to
- Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment, as amended, agreed to
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Mullin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Mullin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Senator Mullin requested roll call on motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; disagreed to Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 6, Nays = 24
- Senator Sears explained vote
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Illuzzi motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Senator Illuzzi requested & granted leave to withdraw motion
- Pending third reading, motion by Senator(s) Illuzzi to amend Senate proposal of amendment agreed to
- Pending third reading, motion by Senator(s) Illuzzi and Kitchel to amend Senate proposal of amendment agreed to
- Pending third reading, motion by Senator(s) Shumlin to amend Senate proposal of amendment agreed to
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Bartlett, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 3
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator Bartlett for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Read 2nd time
- 3rd reading ordered
- Senator(s) Mullin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 3
- Senator Mullin requested & granted leave to withdraw motion
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Turner of Milton withdrawn
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Heath of Westford agreed to
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Rodgers of Glover, Marcotte of Coventry, Higley of Lowell, Johnson of Canaan, Kilmartin of Newport City, Lewis of Derby, Peaslee of Guildhall, and Wheeler of Derby agreed to
- Pending Third Reading, bill amended as offered by Rep. Rodgers of Glover, Marcotte of Coventry, Higley of Lowell, Johnson of Canaan, Kilmartin of Newport City, Lewis of Derby, Peaslee of Guildhall, and Wheeler of Derby
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Fisher of Lincoln, Jewett of Ripton, Lanpher of Vergennes, Maier of Middlebury, Nuovo of Middlebury, Sharpe of Bristol, and Stevens of Shoreham agreed to
- Rep. McDonald of Berlin demanded yeas and nays
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Larson of Burlington agreed to
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Sweaney of Windsor agreed to
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 80, Nays = 63
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Poirier of Barre City agreed to
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 50
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Peltz of Woodbury, Ram of Burlington, and Zuckerman of Burlington agreed to
- Rep. McDonald of Berlin demanded yeas and nays
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 84, Nays = 60
- Read Third time
- Rep. Komline of Dorset demanded yeas and nays
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 52
- Passed
- Rep. South of St. Johnsbury demanded yeas and nays
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Donovan of Burlington agreed to
- Rep. Heath of Westford spoke for the committee on Appropriations
- Read Second Time
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Heath of Westford agreed to
- Third Reading Ordered
- Motion to recommit to Committee on Appropriations by Rep. Hube of Londonderry disagreed to
- Rep. Komline of Dorset demanded yeas and nays
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 45, Nays = 101
- Rep. Komline of Dorset demanded yeas and nays
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 53
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52
+ − Votes (11)
May 9, 2009: Shall the report of the Committee of Conference be adopted?
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 6
May 7, 2009: Shall the Senate accept and adopt the report of the Committee of Conference?
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 2
April 23, 2009: Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
April 23, 2009: Shall the Senate proposal of amendment be amended as moved by Senator Mullin?
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 24
April 22, 2009: Shall the Senate propose to the House that the bill be amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations?
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
April 3, 2009: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 3
April 3, 2009: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Poirier of Barre City?
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 50
- Absent: 5
April 3, 2009: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Reps. Peltz of Woodbury et al?
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 60
- Absent: 5
April 3, 2009: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Fisher of Lincoln?
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 63
- Absent: 6
April 2, 2009: Shall the bill be recommitted to the Committee of Appropriations?
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 101
- Absent: 3
April 2, 2009: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 53
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
House Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor