+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on June 2, 2021
- Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
- House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on June 8, 2021
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Rep. Ancel of Calais, Beck of St. Johnsbury, Brennan of Colchester, Canfield of Fair Haven, Durfee of Shaftsbury, Elder of Starksboro, Kornheiser of Brattleboro, Masland of Thetford, Mattos of Milton, Ode of Burlington, and Till of Jericho moved t
- Senate proposal of amendment considered
- Senate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Ancel of Calais, Beck of St. Johnsbury, Brennan of Colchester, Canfield of Fair Haven, Durfee of Shaftsbury, Elder of Starksboro, Kornheiser of Brattleboro
- Rep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro moved to amend the House proposal of amendment offered by Rep. Ancel of Calais, Beck of St. Johnsbury, Brennan of Colchester, Canfield of Fair Haven, Durfee of Shaftsbury, Elder of Starksboro, Kornheiser of Brattleb
- Which was agreed to
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
- Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read Third time and passed
- Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 125
- Rep. Hooper of Burlington demanded yeas and nays
- Rep. Cina of Burlington, Howard of Rutland City, Anthony of Barre City, Burke of Brattleboro, Colburn of Burlington, Cordes of Lincoln, Hooper of Burlington, Mulvaney-Stanak of Burlington, Small of Winooski, Vyhovsky of Essex, and Yantachka of Char
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Ode of Burlington agreed to
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading ordered
- Rep. Ode of Burlington spoke for the Committee on Ways and Means
- Read Second time
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 24, 2021
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 26, 2021: Shall the bill be amended as offered by Rep. Cina of Burlington and others?
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 125
- Absent: 3