+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2017
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 23, 2017
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 17, 2017
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
- Senate Proposal of Amendment considered
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Consideration postponed to 2:00pm on motion of Senator Ashe
- New Business/Third Reading
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Pearson, Ashe, Baruth, Ingram, Lyons, Sirotkin, and Bray motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Rodgers motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Question divided on demand of Senator Rodgers
- Pending third reading, Senator(s) Rodgers, Bray, Campion, MacDonald, and Pearson motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
- Consideration resumed
- Senator Rodgers requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment
- Proposal of amendment agreed to
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
- Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
- 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife as amended agreed to
- Report of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Rep. Sullivan of Burlington reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife
- Read Second Time
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 1, 2017: Shall the bill be read the third time?
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor