+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on 3/8/2012
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on 3/5/2012
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Passed the House and Senate on 2/29/2012
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Galbraith
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Reported favorably by Senator Galbraith for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
- New Business/Second Reading
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Read Third time and Passed
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
- Third Reading Ordered
- Amendment of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to
- Rep. Moran of Wardsboro reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
- Rep. Savage of Swanton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor