+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On May 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
- Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator McAllister, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 9
- New Business/Third Reading
- Senator Galbraith explained vote
- Roll Call, requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 13
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably by Senator Mullin for Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collins for Committee on Education
- Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) McCormack and Mullin agreed to
- Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations amended as moved by Senator(s) Mullin
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to
- Senator Sears explained vote
- Senator Starr explained vote
- 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 1
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
- Entered on Notice Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Campbell
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 95, Nays = 43
- Passed
- Read Third time
- Rep. Nuovo of Middlebury moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Report of the Committee on Education amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
- Read Second Time
- Rep. Johnson of South Hero, recommended for the committee on Appropriations
- Report of the Committee on Education amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Browning of Arlington disagreed to
- Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge moved to amend the report of the committee on Education, which was agreed to.
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 46
- Amendment of Committee on Education agreed to
- Third Reading Ordered
- Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 43
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rep. Rep. Greshin of Warren, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
- Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rep. Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge reported for the committee on Education
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2014: Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment?
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2014: Shall the report of the Committee on Appropriation be amended as recommended by Senator Mullin?
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
May 1, 2014: Shall the bill be read the third time?
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
May 1, 2013: Shall the bill pass?
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 11
April 30, 2013: Shall the bill be amended as recommended by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge?
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 46
- Absent: 6
April 30, 2013: Shall the bill be read a third time?
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 9