+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 18, 2015
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading ordered
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs agreed to
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Balint for Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs
- New Business/Second Reading
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Government Operations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs on motion of Senator White
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health & Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Ayer
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health & Welfare
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Read Third time
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs as amended agreed to
- Which was agreed to
- Rep. Gonzalez of Winooski moved to amend the bill
- Rep. Gonzalez of Winooski reported for the committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing & Military Affairs
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 18 V.S.A. § 5302 - Definitions
- 18 V.S.A. § 5319 - Disposition of remains of dead
- 18 V.S.A. §5302 - Definitions
- 18 V.S.A. §5319 - Disposition of remains of dead
- 18 V.S.A. §5323 - Natural burial grounds; exemptions