+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on 6/1/2009
- Delivered to the Governor on 5/26/2009
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
- Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Shumlin
- 3rd reading ordered
- Reported favorably by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Finance
- Read 2nd time
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- New Business/Second Reading
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Favorable report by Committee on Finance
- Second Reading
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Shumlin
- Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
- Read Third time and Passed
- Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
- Amendment of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to and Third Reading Ordered
- Amendment as offered by Rep. Ancel of Calais, Branagan of Georgia, Clarkson of Woodstock, Condon of Colchester, Howard of Rutland City, Hube of Londonderry, Masland of Thetford, Obuchowski of Rockingham, Sharpe of Bristol, Winters of Williamstown, and Zuckerman of Burlington agreed to
- Rep. Ancel of Calais reported for the committee on Ways and Means
- Rep. Bissonnette of Winooski reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
- Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor