+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read Third time and Passed
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Amendment of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to
- Rep. Wilson of Manchester reported for the committee on Ways and Means
- Read Second Time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/8/2011
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor