+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Rep. Bissonnette of Winooski moved to commit bill to the committee on Transportation which was agreed to.
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Action postponed until 3/10/2011 as moved by Rep. Bissonnette of Winooski
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Action postponed until 3/9/2011 as moved by Rep. Bissonnette of Winooski
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading Ordered
- Report of Committee on Transportation agreed to.
- Rep. Bissonnette of Winooski reported for the committee on Transportation
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor