+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- House message: Governor approved bill on May 12, 2021
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor on May 12, 2021
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on May 6, 2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
- New Business/Third Reading
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- New Business/Second Reading
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Terenzini for Committee on Health and Welfare
- Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
- 3rd reading ordered
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
- Entered on Notice Calendar
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read Third time and passed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading ordered
- Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to
- Rep. Peterson of Clarendon reported for the Committee on Health Care
- Read Second time
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Health Care
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor