+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ motion, special order
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor