+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 8
January 23, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
January 15, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor