+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ to House
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
June 18, 2020: Senate/ circled
June 18, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
June 18, 2020: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
June 18, 2020: Senate/ uncircled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor