+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ floor amendment
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ motion, special order
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 31, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 19, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor