+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2018: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 6, 2018: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor