+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (59)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Bill Substituted by Conference Committee
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
- Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ refused to recede from House amendment
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (12)
March 7, 2016: House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
March 7, 2016: House Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2016: Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt
March 7, 2016: Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2016: Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments
March 2, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
March 2, 2016: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 26, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 1, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor