+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Comm/ amended
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor