+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor