+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 3
March 10, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor