+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 10
March 8, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 4, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 2, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 26, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor