+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ place on Consent Calendar
- House/ lifted from Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 11, 2014: House/ uncircled
March 11, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
March 11, 2014: House/ circled
March 6, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
February 26, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 25, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 12, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor