+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 29, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 26, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 22, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor